THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:53:03 PM
Sarabia, Alicia
CPSO#:
63675
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sarabia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 24 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 6 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 4, 2019, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Alicia Sarabia in respect of an incident that took place in December, 2007.