THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:02:13 AM
Laws, Margaret-Anne
CPSO#:
63673
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaret-Anne Laws Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 May 1999
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2023 |