THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:49:10 AM
Kane, Sheri-Lynn Catherine
CPSO#:
63672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
P,O. Box 5777, Stn. B
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERI-LYNN CATHERINE KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1992 |