THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:04:15 AM
Ramlall, Awadhesh Kumar
CPSO#:
63651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9136 23 Ave NW
InspiroMed Clinics
Edmonton AB T6N 1H9
Phone: 780-784-0920
Fax: 780-784-6689
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Kumar Ramlall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2007
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AWADHESH KUMAR RAMLALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMLALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1992 |