THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:12:53 PM
Guppy, Barry Robert
CPSO#:
63647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Eglantine Driveway
Health Canada, 3rd Floor
Room 3376, Building 6
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY ROBERT GUPPY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPPY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1992 |