THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:26:49 AM
Waldbillig, David Kelly
CPSO#:
63642
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (519) 749-6411
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID KELLY WALDBILLIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDBILLIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1992 |