THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:07:25 PM
Pradko, James Fred
CPSO#:
63617
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N9A 3H9
Phone: 519-254-0605
Fax: 519-254-0609
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 May 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES FRED PRADKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADKO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2013 |