THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:04:16 AM
McNamara, Laura Ann
CPSO#:
63608
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1120
Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Phone: 5193792923
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Laura McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 May 2023 |