THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:21:32 AM
Molleken, Lynda Louise
CPSO#:
63583
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1401-5000 Yonge Street
Operation Stress Injury Program
St. Joseph's Health Care
Toronto ON M2N 7E9
Phone: 18882376967
Fax: 4165909048
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LYNDA LOUISE MOLLEKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLLEKEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1992 |