THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:06:28 AM
Graves, Peter Stephen
CPSO#:
63570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Quinte Health North Hastings Hospital |
Bancroft |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER STEPHEN GRAVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1992 |