THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:47:24 PM
Kim, Jarmila
CPSO#:
63563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rausa, Jarmila (used until: 06 Sep 1993 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Department of Anaesthesia
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Fax: (613) 737-4815
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JARMILA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1992 |