THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:19:40 PM
McCluskey, Stephen Douglas
CPSO#:
63554
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
984 Oliver Road
Suite 102
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 766-3599
Fax: (807) 766-3598
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:26 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCCLUSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLUSKEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 29 Apr 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2003 to 14 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2005 to 15 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1992 |