THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:22:34 AM
Kawam, Michael Philip
CPSO#:
63553
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Phone: 6139699742
Fax: 6139697166
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PHILIP KAWAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1992 |