THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:06:17 AM
Rubenchik, Illana Aviva
CPSO#:
63544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Dept. of Laboratories
4 South-East, Room 113
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6254
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
|
Active |