THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:13:11 AM
Husain, Siraj Mohammed
CPSO#:
63541
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tom Baker Cancer Center
1331-29 Street North West
Calgary AB T2N 4N2
Phone: (403) 521-3164
Fax: (403) 283-1651
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIRAJ MOHAMMED HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1991 |