THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:03:46 PM
Lee, Betty
CPSO#:
63539
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58560
Fax: (905) 494-6614
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BETTY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1991 |