THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:47:13 PM
Smosarski, David John
CPSO#:
63500
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 May 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
414 Victoria Ave North
Suite M1
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 529-5221 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 667-0508
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Smosarski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite M4
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Tel: 905-529-5221
Date Received: 19 Feb 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN SMOSARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMOSARSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2019 |