THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:17:42 PM
Katsios, Zaharo
CPSO#:
63496
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Z. Katsios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
www.recordsolution.ca
Date Received: 02 Jun 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2023 |