THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:00:49 PM
Sirzyk, Jeffrey
CPSO#:
63480
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Sep 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY SIRZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRZYK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1992 |