THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:39:38 PM
Brymer, Christopher David
CPSO#:
63468
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Christopher Brymer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2022
Corporation Name: Christopher Brymer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2022 |