THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:14:40 AM
Lam, Wai-Ching
CPSO#:
63438
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2807
825 Church Street
Toronto ON M4W 3Z4
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Wai Ching Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions Inc.
Tel: 416-781-9083 ext. 1
Date Received: 23 Jun 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:18 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAI-CHING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1991 |