THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:56:18 AM
Park, Myung Ill
CPSO#:
63403
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Kyungpook National University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Myung I. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:York Diagnostic Centre, 3585 Keele St. Unit 4 , Toronto, ON M3J 3H5 Tel. 416 398 2288
Date Received: 29 Jun 2022
Instructions/Address:Downsview Endoscopy Clinic, 1635 Lawrence Ave.W. Suite 201, Toronto On. M6L 3C9 Tel. 416 630 7388
Date Received: 28 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |