THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:18:24 PM
Tey, Andy Sing Seng
CPSO#:
63402
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tey, Sing Seng (used until: 25 Aug 1999 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Malaya, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
48 Penwick Crescent
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5B4
Phone: (905) 508-4607
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDY SING SENG TEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1996 |