THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:24:25 AM
Benoit, Marie Jose
CPSO#:
63399
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marie Jos Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 27, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marie Jose Benoit to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 27, 2022:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Benoit engaged in professional misconduct. Dr. Benoit, who resigned from the College effective July 1, 2022, has agreed, in the face of this investigation, to never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)