THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:01:42 AM
Brierley, James Duncan
CPSO#:
63361
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Brierley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:31 May 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |