THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:59:09 AM
Shiffman, Kevin
CPSO#:
63342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
603 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P7
Phone: (905) 235-8806
Fax: (905) 235-8807
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Shiffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN SHIFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIFFMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jan 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jan 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2000 |