THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:52:51 PM
Cheung, Vincent Yuk Tong
CPSO#:
63337
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Cheung, Yuk Tong (used until: 21 Jun 1991 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vincent Y. T. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |