THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:57:58 PM
Ali, Liaqat
CPSO#:
63312
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802 Ext. 47210
Fax: (705) 739-5631
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Liaqat Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIAQAT ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2024 |