THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:42:32 AM
Chow, Edward Leung Wong
CPSO#:
63311
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Chow, Leung Wong (used until: 14 Mar 2007 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD LEUNG WONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 11 Aug 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |