THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:51:13 AM
Sonbol, Soliman Moones
CPSO#:
63298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Dec 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
ste 210-1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: 9058370870
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOLIMAN MOONES SONBOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONBOL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1995 |