THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:51:20 AM
Shehata, Sarwat Wadid Mosaad
CPSO#:
63285
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northeast Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:29 May 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARWAT WADID MOSAAD SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1996 |