THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:18:20 PM
Adu-Poku, Yaw
CPSO#:
63266
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Nov 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Akan, English
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Adu-Poku Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 21, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 12, 2013, Quinte Health Care notifited the College that Dr. Adu-Poku's privileges were suspended, effective September 21, 2012.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 May 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |