THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:54:45 PM
Lee, Patricia Elaine
CPSO#:
63239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
B732
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6740
Fax: (416) 480-6741
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELAINE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1991 |