THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:01:02 AM
O'Shea, Eoghan Brendan
CPSO#:
63236
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Nov 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Gaelic
Education: National University of Ireland, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Team
Civic Campus Ottawa Hospital
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jan 2010
Summary:
On January 26, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. O'Shea was medical director, from 2000 to 2002 and approximately September 2005 to June 2006, of Canadian Cancer Research Group (CCRG), a private complementary medicine organization whose patient population consisted of, among others, terminally ill cancer patients. While employed at, affiliated with or consulting for CCRG, Dr.O'Shea failed to maintain the standard of practice by: a) failing to examine the organization's patients or obtain informed consent before prescribing to them; b) failing to communicate with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists; and c) failing to make reference in his charts to communications with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.O'Shea's certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;
(b) Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine practice;
(c) Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its related organizations;
(d) To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary Medicine, Dr.O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time, including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and examining patients before prescribing to them; and
(e) At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of this Order.
2. Dr. O'Shea pay to the College costs in the amount of $3, 650.00.
3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Appeal: No Appeal