THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:35:32 AM
Mayer, Perry Vincent
CPSO#:
63219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 May 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton ON L8R 2R3
Phone: (905) 523-1444
Fax: (905) 523-6600
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PERRY VINCENT MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Nov 1990 to 30 Nov 1990
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1998 |