THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:40:06 AM
Levin, Morris Frank
CPSO#:
63208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
P O Box 2007 189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2009
Fax: (519) 631-8842
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Morris F. Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MORRIS FRANK LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |