THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:35:37 AM
Kevorkian, Agavni
CPSO#:
63207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, Russian
Education: Erevan Medical Institute, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
24 Tullamore Drive
Toronto ON M2L 2E8
Phone: (416) 444-0702
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AGAVNI KEVORKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEVORKIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 18 Oct 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 18 Oct 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 18 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1999 |