THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:01:10 AM
Appavoo, Samuel Devadason
CPSO#:
63204
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Oct 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road
Goderich ON N7A 4N3
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL DEVADASON APPAVOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPAVOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 27 Nov 1990 to 06 Jan 1991
EL - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 07 Jan 1991 to 25 Jan 1991
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jan 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1992 |