THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:12:12 AM
Kanungo, Tarit Kumar
CPSO#:
63192
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Calcutta, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kanungo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain medical records may call Rasci at the phone number above.
Phone: 1-800-971-8038
Date Received: 31 Jul 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:09 Dec 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2019 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tarit Kumar Kanungo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 1, 2019:
Effective October 1, 2019, Dr. Kanungo has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions with the exception of practicing as a surgical or operating room assistant.