THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:19:52 PM
Bhangu, Raminder Kaur
CPSO#:
63175
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rai, Raminder Kaur (used until: 28 Feb 1999 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3605 Genesys Parkway
Grand Blanc MI 48439
United States
Phone: (810) 606-7155
Fax: 810 606 7152
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMINDER KAUR BHANGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 1 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 1994 |