THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:12:48 PM
Ryan, John Gerard
CPSO#:
63161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613 737 8899 Ext. 73249
Fax: 613 737 8207
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John G. Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN GERARD RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1990 |