THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:27:37 PM
Maher, John
CPSO#:
63155
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
48 Alliance Boulevard
Unit 101
Barrie ON L4M 5K3
Phone: 705-721-1060
Fax: 705-721-2406
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Maher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 23 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Sep 1990 to 12 Oct 1990
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Oct 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 17 Nov 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1997 |