THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:45:02 AM
Edward, Raouf Khalil Abdallah
CPSO#:
63153
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Abdallah, Raouf Edward Khalil (used until: 28 Oct 1990 )
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R. Edward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 19 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |