THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:38:45 PM
Naser Al-Mobarak, Bassem Issa Mohammed
CPSO#:
63131
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:12 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASSEM ISSA MOHAMMED NASER AL-MOBARAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASER AL-MOBARAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Jul 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1997 |