THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:25:52 PM
Senthelal, Sashikala
CPSO#:
63130
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Jaffna, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7586
Fax: (905) 848-7602
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Aug 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SASHIKALA SENTHELAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHELAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1996 |