THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:10:05 PM
Rehaluk, Robert Michael
CPSO#:
63111
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Del Noreste, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2318 Lake Shore Boulevard
suite 203
toronto
m8v 1b5
Milton ON L9T 5E6
Phone: 417 4074586
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL REHALUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHALUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1995 |