THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:30:54 PM
El-Kholi, Vivian Magdy
CPSO#:
63108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Dec 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway W. U# 202
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: 905-272-1114
Fax: 905-272-1147
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIVIAN MAGDY EL-KHOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KHOLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Nov 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1996 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1997 |