THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:58:20 PM
Hurst, Lorne Douglas Campbell
CPSO#:
63063
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-1630 Ness Ave
Winnipeg MB R3J 3X1
Phone: 204-942-4808
Fax: 204-956-0587
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:09 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORNE DOUGLAS CAMPBELL HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1991 |