THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:29:35 AM
Bismonte, Maria Dulce Buenafe
CPSO#:
63057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bismonte, Maria Dulce (used until: 25 May 1992 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 236-9728
Fax: (416) 744-8106
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA DULCE BUENAFE BISMONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMONTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Nov 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1996 |