THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:48:25 PM
Chan, Bok Man
CPSO#:
63056
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of London, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 5071
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Jul 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOK MAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1994 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2020 |